|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1921 | 19/11/1921 | 13 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1923 | 05/05/1923 | 117 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1925 | 19/09/1925 | 124 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1926 | 23/01/1926 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1927 | 08/10/1927 | 93 days | General | Altered to GE gauge Boiler number 7452 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1928 | 23/11/1928 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 7265 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1929 | 21/12/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1931 | 25/04/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1933 | 13/05/1933 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 7546 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1935 | 09/03/1935 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1939 | 18/11/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1942 | 02/05/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/02/1944 | 01/04/1944 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 7616 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/10/1945 | 10/11/1945 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1947 | 11/01/1947 | -250 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1948 | 11/12/1948 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61756 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 21 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1951 | 04/12/1951 | 54 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/10/1952 | 06/12/1952 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/04/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 21161 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/06/1955 | 03/09/1955 | 66 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/06/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/08/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21186 (Diagram 3) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/05/1958 | Spalding MPD | Spalding, ex M. & G.N. shed is no longer supplied by New England but by Boston. On 11th May the following were on shed-D2234, 43059/ 61/2/4/5/80/3/5, 61756, 64171/2/91, 64231 /78 an 68560 all of Boston (40F). | SLS/195806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1666 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21977 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
07/11/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1921. Dep: 19/11/1921. | ||
09/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1923. Dep: 05/05/1923. | ||
21/02/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4666 | ||
19/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1925. Dep: 19/09/1925. | ||
30/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1926. Dep: 23/01/1926. | ||
08/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge Boiler number 7452 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1928. Dep: 23/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7265 (Diagram 3) |
||
09/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 21/12/1929. | ||
21/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
09/09/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7546 (Diagram 3) |
||
24/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
25/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935. | ||
03/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
09/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
12/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
20/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. | ||
14/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) |
||
25/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
23/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1942. Dep: 02/05/1942. | ||
20/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7616 (Diagram 3) |
||
03/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945. | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
06/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1756 | ||
11/01/1947 | Modification | Diagram 3 number C1828 boiler fitted | ||
19/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1947. Dep: 11/01/1947. | ||
14/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61756 |
||
08/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
03/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. | ||
12/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/10/1951. Dep: 04/12/1951. | ||
28/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. | ||
01/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21161 (Diagram 3) |
||
30/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955. | ||
13/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957. | ||
06/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957. | ||
29/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21186 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
29/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
22/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61756 from Kings Cross (34A) | ||
1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |