Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4320 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17726 Week
» 70742 Month
» 190269 Year
» 3217122 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3814 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1974 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61974 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1683 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/07/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1936 |
ANN |
|
Annesley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
19/02/1955 |
40B |
|
Immingham |
w/e |
24/12/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/07/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
5w/e |
31/12/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3814 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1683 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1974 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61974 |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61974 |
|
|