|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/01/1917 | 17/02/1917 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1920 | 03/07/1920 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1922 | 27/01/1923 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1925 | 07/03/1925 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5275 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1927 | 07/01/1928 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1929 | 07/12/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1931 | 23/01/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1934 | 28/04/1934 | 36 days | General | Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1937 | 13/03/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3107 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1941 | 03/05/1941 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 707 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1947 | 17/01/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3104 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9053 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1915 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 275 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
13/01/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1917. Dep: 17/02/1917. | ||
24/04/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920. | ||
16/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923. | ||
17/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 07/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5275 |
||
05/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 07/01/1928. | ||
02/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929. | ||
26/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1931. Dep: 23/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) |
||
24/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. Work undertaken: Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14) |
||
13/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14) |
||
23/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3107 (Diagram 14) |
||
27/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
05/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941. | ||
05/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
31/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
07/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 707 (Diagram 14) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9053 | ||
06/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 17/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3104 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9053 |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 69053 but not taken up | ||
17/07/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9053 from Neasden (34E) |