Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 354 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1423 Week
» 1423 Month
» 68285 Year
» 1733661 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 276 m/e 04/1915
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5276   30/10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9054   25/08/1946
British Railways 69054   10/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L304/1915
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 04/1915 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 29/08/1949 off Neasden (NEA)
Service Life 34 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 04/1915
NEA   Neasden on 20/10/1922
IMM   Immingham on 10/03/1923
MAR   March on 17/08/1929
IMM   Immingham on 16/03/1931
NEA   Neasden on 18/01/1941
WFD   Woodford Halse on 02/02/1941
NEA   Neasden on 27/09/1941
     Withdrawn on 29/08/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1915 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 683)
17/11/1923 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 60)
06/06/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1671)
28/04/1934 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 163)
06/03/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 645)
27/01/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1672)
22/01/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 657)
10/04/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3119)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 21/10/1916 18/11/1916 29 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 22/12/1917 23/02/1918 64 days General    
Gorton Works 07/05/1921 02/07/1921 57 days General    
Gorton Works 15/09/1923 17/11/1923 64 days General Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1926 30/10/1926 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5276
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1928 01/12/1928 43 days General    
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 06/06/1931 36 days General Boiler number 1671 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1934 28/04/1934 29 days General Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1937 06/03/1937 22 days General Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1939 27/01/1940 43 days General Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1940 20/07/1940 36 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1943 22/01/1944 39 days General Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1945 17/02/1945 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 06/03/1948 10/04/1948 36 days General Boiler number 3119 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69054
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1915 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 276
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
21/10/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1916. Dep: 18/11/1916.    
22/12/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1917. Dep: 23/02/1918.    
07/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1921. Dep: 02/07/1921.    
20/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
10/03/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
15/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1923. Dep: 17/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14)
   
21/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1926. Dep: 30/10/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5276
   
20/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928.    
17/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
16/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1671 (Diagram 14)
   
31/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
   
13/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14)
   
16/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 27/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14)
   
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
18/01/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
02/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
27/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
15/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14)
   
10/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945.    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9054    
06/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3119 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69054
   
29/08/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 69054 from Neasden (NEA)    

prev prev