|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/10/1916 | 18/11/1916 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1917 | 23/02/1918 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1921 | 02/07/1921 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1923 | 17/11/1923 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1926 | 30/10/1926 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5276 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1928 | 01/12/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1931 | 06/06/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1671 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1934 | 28/04/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1937 | 06/03/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1939 | 27/01/1940 | 43 days | General | Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 36 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1945 | 17/02/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1948 | 10/04/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3119 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR 69054 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1915 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 276 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
21/10/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1916. Dep: 18/11/1916. | ||
22/12/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1917. Dep: 23/02/1918. | ||
07/05/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1921. Dep: 02/07/1921. | ||
20/10/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
10/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
15/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1923. Dep: 17/11/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14) |
||
21/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1926. Dep: 30/10/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5276 |
||
20/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928. | ||
17/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
16/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
02/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1671 (Diagram 14) |
||
31/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14) |
||
13/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14) |
||
16/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 27/01/1940. Work undertaken: Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14) |
||
15/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
18/01/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
02/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
27/09/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
15/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14) |
||
10/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945. | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9054 | ||
06/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3119 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR 69054 |
||
29/08/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69054 from Neasden (NEA) |