Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 61 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2987 Week
» 4725 Month
» 132168 Year
» 1797544 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 336 m/e 04/1915
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5336   23/08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9055 on 03/02/1946
British Railways 69055   25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L304/1915
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 04/1915 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 23/07/1951 off Neasden (34E)
Service Life 36 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 04/1915
NEA   Neasden on 14/10/1921
IMM   Immingham on 24/06/1931
NEA   Neasden on 26/10/1939
WFD   Woodford Halse on 02/02/1941
NEA   Neasden on 27/09/1941
     Withdrawn on 23/07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 23/07/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1915 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 953)
23/08/1924 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 977)
28/03/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1673)
07/10/1939 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3113)
17/04/1943 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3112)
22/09/1945 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3123)
25/09/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 657)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 06/10/1917 17/11/1917 43 days General    
Gorton Works 25/05/1918 17/08/1918 85 days General After collision
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1921 23/07/1921 50 days General    
Gorton Works 05/07/1924 23/08/1924 50 days General Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5336
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1926 23/10/1926 71 days General    
Gorton Works 28/02/1931 28/03/1931 29 days General Boiler number 1673 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1933 13/01/1934 43 days General    
Gorton Works 11/04/1936 16/05/1936 36 days General Heating apparatus removed
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1937 27/02/1937 22 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 16/09/1939 07/10/1939 22 days General Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1943 17/04/1943 37 days General Boiler number 3112 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1945 22/09/1945 43 days General Boiler number 3123 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1948 25/09/1948 36 days General Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69055
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1915 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 336
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
06/10/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1917. Dep: 17/11/1917.    
25/05/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1918. Dep: 17/08/1918.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
04/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1921. Dep: 23/07/1921.    
14/10/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
05/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1924. Dep: 23/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5336
   
14/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1926. Dep: 23/10/1926.    
28/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1673 (Diagram 14)
   
24/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934.    
11/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
   
06/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937.    
16/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 14)
   
26/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
02/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
27/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
12/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3112 (Diagram 14)
   
11/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3123 (Diagram 14)
   
03/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9055    
21/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69055
   
23/07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 69055 from Neasden (34E)    

prev prev