|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/10/1917 | 17/11/1917 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1918 | 17/08/1918 | 85 days | General | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1921 | 23/07/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1924 | 23/08/1924 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5336 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1926 | 23/10/1926 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1931 | 28/03/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1673 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1933 | 13/01/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 36 days | General | Heating apparatus removed |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1943 | 17/04/1943 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3112 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1945 | 22/09/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3123 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1948 | 25/09/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR 69055 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1915 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 336 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
06/10/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1917. Dep: 17/11/1917. | ||
25/05/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1918. Dep: 17/08/1918. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
04/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1921. Dep: 23/07/1921. | ||
14/10/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
05/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1924. Dep: 23/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 977 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5336 |
||
14/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1926. Dep: 23/10/1926. | ||
28/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1673 (Diagram 14) |
||
24/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
02/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934. | ||
11/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Heating apparatus removed |
||
06/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. | ||
16/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 14) |
||
26/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
02/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
27/09/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
12/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3112 (Diagram 14) |
||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3123 (Diagram 14) |
||
03/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9055 | ||
21/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR 69055 |
||
23/07/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69055 from Neasden (34E) |