Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 344 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5955 Week
» 17001 Month
» 17001 Year
» 1682377 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 338 m/e 06/1915
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5338   28/02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9057 on 24/03/1946
British Railways 69057 on Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L306/1915
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1915 to Woodford Halse (WFD)
Withdrawal Mon 10/10/1949 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 34 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse (New) m/e 06/1915
NEA Neasden on 09/08/1925
MEX Mexborough on 01/07/1929
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 21/11/1942
MEX Mexborough on 20/02/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 28/08/1946
FRO Frodingham on 09/03/1947
   Withdrawn on 10/10/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham on 09/03/1947
WDN FRO Frodingham on 10/10/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1915 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 987)
30/12/1922 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1577)
28/02/1925 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1556)
05/05/1928 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 334)
07/02/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 997)
31/03/1934 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 745)
04/07/1936 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 342)
13/01/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1673)
23/10/1943 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 60)
01/03/1947 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3126)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/06/1917 28/07/1917 36 days General  
Gorton Works 10/01/1920 06/02/1920 28 days General  
Gorton Works 11/11/1922 30/12/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 1577 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1925 28/02/1925 57 days General
Boiler number 1556 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5338
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 05/05/1928 64 days General
Boiler number 334 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1931 07/02/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 997 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1934 31/03/1934 50 days General
Boiler number 745 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 04/07/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1939 13/01/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 1673 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1943 23/10/1943 45 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1947 01/03/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 3126 (Diagram 14)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1915 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 338
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
09/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
01/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
20/02/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9057    
28/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
09/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69057 but not taken up    
10/10/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9057 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev