Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1017 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2189 Week
» 21090 Month
» 21090 Year
» 1686466 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 341 m/e 06/1916
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5341   01/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9060   31/03/1946
British Railways 69060   01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L306/1916
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1916 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 07/06/1954 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 38 yrs , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Used as stationary boiler at Stratford works until condemned in August 1957. Cut up at Stratford.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) m/e 06/1916
WFD Woodford Halse on 28/03/1929
NEA Neasden on 19/02/1931
MEX Mexborough on 07/09/1933
NEA Neasden on 18/11/1939
WFD Woodford Halse on 02/02/1941
NEA Neasden on 27/09/1941
34A Kings Cross on 31/05/1953
36C Frodingham on 21/06/1953
   Withdrawn on 07/06/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   on 07/06/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1916 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1574)
01/03/1924 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1813)
17/04/1926 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 614)
21/10/1933 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 605)
19/06/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1672)
02/09/1939 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3112)
29/08/1942 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3101)
09/12/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 590)
01/05/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3122)
21/04/1951 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 22007)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/12/1916 13/01/1917 29 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1918 22/02/1919 71 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1921 01/10/1921 64 days General  
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 01/03/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1813 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5341
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1926 17/04/1926 50 days General
Boiler number 614 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1929 09/11/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 21/10/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 605 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1937 19/06/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1939 02/09/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 3112 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1942 29/08/1942 27 days General
Boiler number 3101 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1944 09/12/1944 36 days General
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 590 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1948 01/05/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3122 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69060
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1951 21/04/1951 36 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 22007 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1953 26/12/1953 15 days Light Casual
After collision
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1916 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 341
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
28/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
19/02/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
07/09/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/11/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
02/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
27/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9060    
31/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
21/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
07/06/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69060 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev