Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 1013 Today
» 887 Yesterday
» 6815 Week
» 18052 Month
» 250972 Year
» 1916348 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 367 m/e 03/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5367   09/10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9066   11/08/1946
British Railways 69066   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L303/1917
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 03/1917 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 17/04/1950 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 22/4/50

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 03/1917
NEA   Neasden on 20/10/1922
IMM   Immingham on 10/03/1923
KEA   Keadby on 24/06/1929
IMM   Immingham on 21/11/1929
MEX   Mexborough on 29/10/1937
WFD   Woodford Halse on 07/08/1942
MEX   Mexborough on 21/06/1943
NEA   Neasden on 25/08/1946
MEX   Mexborough on 11/08/1947
FRO   Frodingham on 22/02/1948
FRO   Frodingham w/e 28/02/1948
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 11/08/1947
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 28/02/1948
WDN 36C Frodingham on 17/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1917 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1672)
23/11/1929 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1909)
30/10/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 648)
24/05/1941 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 670)
05/02/1944 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3120)
09/08/1947 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 605)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 18/10/1919 20/12/1919 64 days General    
Gorton Works 03/03/1923 12/05/1923 71 days General    
Gorton Works 03/07/1926 09/10/1926 99 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5367
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1928 31/03/1928 57 days General    
Gorton Works 19/10/1929 23/11/1929 36 days General Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 13/06/1931 43 days General    
Gorton Works 03/03/1934 07/04/1934 36 days General    
Gorton Works 02/10/1937 30/10/1937 29 days General Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1941 24/05/1941 43 days General Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1943 05/02/1944 44 days General Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1947 09/08/1947 57 days General Boiler number 605 (Diagram 14)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1917 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 367
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
18/10/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1919. Dep: 20/12/1919.    
20/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1923. Dep: 12/05/1923.    
10/03/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1926. Dep: 09/10/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5367
   
04/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 31/03/1928.    
24/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
19/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14)
   
21/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931.    
03/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934.    
02/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 648 (Diagram 14)
   
29/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 670 (Diagram 14)
   
07/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
24/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1943. Dep: 05/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 14)
   
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9066    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
14/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 605 (Diagram 14)
   
11/08/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
28/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69066 but not taken up    
17/04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9066 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev