Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 121 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2286 Week
» 2286 Month
» 69148 Year
» 1734524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 368 m/e 03/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5368   27/09/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9067   21/07/1946
British Railways 69067   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L303/1917
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 03/1917 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 19/02/1951 off Neasden (34E)
Service Life 33 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 24/2/51

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 03/1917
WFD   Woodford Halse on 08/11/1919
NEA   Neasden on 01/08/1926
WFD   Woodford Halse on 25/03/1929
NEA   Neasden on 29/06/1929
MAR   March on 24/09/1929
GOR   Gorton on 03/10/1931
TFD   Trafford Park (LNER) on 18/10/1932
MEX   Mexborough on 27/12/1933
DON   Doncaster on 27/01/1934
MEX   Mexborough on 30/05/1934
IMM   Immingham on 24/01/1936
GOR   Gorton on 13/03/1943
MEX   Mexborough on 11/04/1944
NEA   Neasden on 21/07/1946
     Withdrawn on 19/02/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1917 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1673)
27/09/1924 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 163)
10/10/1931 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1675)
06/02/1937 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 678)
27/04/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 342)
10/01/1948 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3120)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1919 21/06/1919 78 days General    
Gorton Works 03/12/1921 08/04/1922 127 days General    
Gorton Works 02/08/1924 27/09/1924 57 days General Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5368
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1929 21/09/1929 50 days General    
Gorton Works 29/08/1931 10/10/1931 43 days General Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1936 06/02/1937 38 days General Boiler number 678 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1937 31/12/1937 35 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1940 27/04/1940 36 days General Boiler number 342 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1941 18/01/1941 15 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1943 13/03/1943 37 days General    
Gorton Works 10/02/1945 03/03/1945 22 days Light Repair Main frame damaged
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1947 10/01/1948 43 days General Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 14)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1917 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 368
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
05/04/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1919. Dep: 21/06/1919.    
08/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1921. Dep: 08/04/1922.    
02/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 27/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 163 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5368
   
01/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
25/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
29/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929.    
24/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
29/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1675 (Diagram 14)
   
03/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
27/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
27/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
30/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
24/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
31/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 06/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 678 (Diagram 14)
   
27/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
23/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 14)
   
04/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
05/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943.    
13/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/04/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Main frame damaged
   
21/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9067    
29/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3120 (Diagram 14)
   
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69067 but not taken up    
19/02/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 9067 from Neasden (34E)    

prev prev