Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 370 y/e 1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5370   21/03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9069   25/08/1946
British Railways 69069   17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class L3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
L31917
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During y/e 1917 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Thu 07/07/1955 off Woodford Halse (38E)
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 9/7/55

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) y/e 1917
ANN   Annesley on 09/04/1920
GOR   Gorton on 02/11/1927
ANN   Annesley on 14/04/1928
MEX   Mexborough on 23/02/1929
IMM   Immingham on 11/11/1937
NEA   Neasden on 20/01/1941
WFD   Woodford Halse on 14/08/1947
     Withdrawn on 07/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse on 14/08/1947
WDN   on 07/07/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1917 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1675)
21/03/1925 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 338)
12/07/1930 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1672)
12/05/1934 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1556)
24/02/1940 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 645)
18/12/1943 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1909)
05/01/1946 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 3114)
17/09/1949 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 745)
06/09/1952 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 22021)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 17/01/1920 21/02/1920 36 days General    
Gorton Works 06/05/1922 01/07/1922 57 days General    
Gorton Works 31/01/1925 21/03/1925 50 days General Boiler number 338 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5370
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1928 17/03/1928 64 days General    
Gorton Works 14/06/1930 12/07/1930 29 days General Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1934 12/05/1934 43 days General Boiler number 1556 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1937 29/05/1937 43 days General    
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 24/02/1940 29 days General Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1943 18/12/1943 36 days General Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1945 05/01/1946 43 days General Boiler number 3114 (Diagram 14)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1947 05/07/1947 22 days General    
Gorton Works 20/08/1949 17/09/1949 29 days General Boiler number 745 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69069
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1952 06/09/1952 29 days General Boiler number 22021 (Diagram 14)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/07/1955 The last of the Great Central 2-6-4 Tanks These engines have become extinct with the withdrawal of No. 69069 on the 7th July last. It is somewhat of a coincidence that the last survivor was the last one built. It will perhaps be useful to detail the various renumberings, the first of which, of course, took place at the grouping in 1924, when the L.N.E.R. classified the engines as 'L1', altered to 'L3' when the new 'Ll' (No. 9000) appeared.
No.BuiltSuccessive numberingsWdn.
272 12.14 5272, 9050 (8.46), 69050 (4.50) 3.55
273 12.14 5273 (2.24), 9051 (12.46), 69051 (11.48) 5.51
274 2.15 5274, 9052 (10.46), 69052 (6.48) 8.54
275 3.15 5275, 9053 (8.46), E. 9053 (3.48) 7.5
276 3.15 5276, 9054 (8.46), 69054 (4.48) 08:49
336 4.15 5336, 9055 (2.46), 69055 (9.48) 7.51
337 5.15 5337, 9056 (3.46), E. 9056 (3.48) 1.51
338 6.15 5338, 9057 (3.46) 10.49
339 ?.15 5339, 9058 (5.46) 8.49
340 ?.15 5340, 9059 (6.46) 8.49
341 ?.16 5341 (3.24), 9060 (3.46), 69060 (5.48) 6.54
342 ?.16 5342, 9061 (11.46), 69061 (11.48) 2.53
343 ?.16 5343, 9062 (10.46), 69062 (6.48) 5.51
344 ?.16 5344, 9063 (8.46) 7.47
345 ?.16 5345, 9064 (10.46), 69064 (8.50) 1.55
366 ?.17 5366, 9065 (8.46), E. 9065 (3.48), 69065 5.45
367 ?.17 5367, 9066 (8.46) 4.5
368 ?.17 5368, 9067 (7.46) 2.51
369 ?.17 5369, 9068 (8.46), E. 9068 (2.48) 6.5
370 ?.17 5370, 9069 (8.46), 69069 (9.49) (8.50) 7.55

Although the last one built was the last survivor, the pioneer of the class had the longest service, 40¼ years. No. 9063 had the rather short life of 31 years, and was the only one which did not come into British Railways stock.
SLS/195606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1917 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 370
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 14 boiler fitted
   
17/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1920. Dep: 21/02/1920.    
09/04/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
06/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922.    
31/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 21/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 338 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5370
   
02/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928.    
14/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
23/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1672 (Diagram 14)
   
31/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 12/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1556 (Diagram 14)
   
17/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937.    
11/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 645 (Diagram 14)
   
20/01/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
13/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 14)
   
24/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3114 (Diagram 14)
   
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9069    
14/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947.    
14/08/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 745 (Diagram 14)
Renumbered to BR 69069
   
09/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22021 (Diagram 14)
   
07/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69069 from Woodford Halse (38E)    

prev