|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/10/1908 | 11/11/1908 | 27 days | General | ||||
06/09/1910 | 11/10/1910 | 36 days | General | ||||
17/08/1912 | 30/09/1912 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 254 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
20/08/1914 | 23/09/1914 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
04/03/1916 | 31/03/1916 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1354 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
03/10/1917 | 21/12/1917 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
04/03/1921 | 28/04/1921 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
28/07/1922 | 09/10/1922 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 445 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
06/11/1923 | 21/12/1923 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 268 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
14/05/1925 | 03/07/1925 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 1354 (Diagram 19A) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6149 |
|||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1928 | 13/11/1928 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 570 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1930 | 29/11/1930 | 27 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1933 | 06/05/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 268 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1935 | 09/03/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8222 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1937 | 21/08/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 232 (Diagram 19A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1904 | To Service | To service as Lancashire, Derbyshire and East Coast Railway Number 30 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4247 Allocated to Tuxford (TUX) Diagram 19A boiler fitted |
||
01/1908 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1149 | ||
29/01/1927 | Modification | Diagram 19A number 268 boiler fitted | ||
20/08/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
24/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
01/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
23/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1928. Dep: 13/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 570 (Diagram 19A) |
||
03/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. | ||
22/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 268 (Diagram 19A) |
||
27/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
10/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
09/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8222 (Diagram 19A) |
||
31/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 232 (Diagram 19A) |
||
09/12/1939 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6149 from Tuxford (TUX) |