|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
30/01/1908 | 14/04/1908 | 76 days | General | ||||
26/07/1909 | 04/01/1910 | 163 days | General | ||||
20/07/1911 | 19/09/1911 | 62 days | General | ||||
19/06/1913 | 20/08/1913 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 1354 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
25/01/1915 | 03/05/1915 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 153 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
24/04/1917 | 09/05/1917 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
30/08/1919 | 13/02/1919 | -197 days | General | ||||
13/11/1920 | 15/12/1920 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1354 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
06/10/1922 | 20/12/1922 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 236 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
05/01/1924 | 25/02/1924 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 570 (Diagram 19A) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6151 |
|||
24/06/1925 | 09/09/1925 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 433 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1928 | 10/03/1928 | 68 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1930 | 22/03/1930 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 232 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1933 | 24/06/1933 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1935 | 14/12/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8220 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1938 | 12/11/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/12/1941 | 31/01/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1942 | 28/11/1942 | 11 days | Light Repair | Frame fractures |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1944 | 19/02/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 4132 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 430 (Diagram 19A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9082 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1947 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1904 | To Service | To service as Lancashire, Derbyshire and East Coast Railway Number 32 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4249 Allocated to Tuxford (TUX) Diagram 19A boiler fitted |
||
01/1908 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1151 | ||
13/02/1919 | Modification | Diagram 19A number 268 boiler fitted | ||
03/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1928. Dep: 10/03/1928. | ||
27/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 232 (Diagram 19A) |
||
21/01/1933 | Modification | Diagram 19A number 8221 boiler fitted | ||
17/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933. | ||
16/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8220 (Diagram 19A) |
||
15/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 12/11/1938. | ||
27/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1941. Dep: 31/01/1942. | ||
18/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942. Work undertaken: Frame fractures |
||
14/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4132 (Diagram 19A) |
||
13/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 430 (Diagram 19A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9082 |
||
04/07/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9082 from Tuxford (TUX) | ||
04/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/07/1947. |