|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/09/1908 | 15/10/1908 | 40 days | General | ||||
01/06/1910 | 25/07/1910 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
17/04/1912 | 28/06/1912 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
20/10/1913 | 13/11/1913 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 278 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
02/02/1915 | 24/02/1915 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 254 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
05/07/1916 | 11/08/1916 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 268 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
01/02/1918 | 07/03/1918 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
01/05/1919 | 20/06/1919 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 570 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
21/02/1921 | 23/03/1921 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 268 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
22/01/1923 | 23/03/1923 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 1354 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
09/10/1924 | 19/11/1924 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 238 (Diagram 19A) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6153 |
|||
26/08/1926 | 04/11/1926 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 236 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1928 | 12/05/1928 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1354 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1930 | 02/05/1930 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 236 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1932 | 21/01/1933 | 43 days | General | New cylinders Boiler number 238 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1935 | 05/10/1935 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1939 | 28/01/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 430 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 33 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 17 days | Light Repair | Frame fractured |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 4131 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1946 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1904 | To Service | To service as Lancashire, Derbyshire and East Coast Railway Number 34 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4251 Allocated to Tuxford (TUX) Diagram 19A boiler fitted |
||
01/1908 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1153 | ||
30/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1354 (Diagram 19A) |
||
16/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1930. Dep: 02/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 236 (Diagram 19A) |
||
10/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1932. Dep: 21/01/1933. Work undertaken: New cylinders Boiler number 238 (Diagram 19A) |
||
14/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935. | ||
07/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 430 (Diagram 19A) |
||
12/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. | ||
13/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. Work undertaken: Frame fractured |
||
29/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4131 (Diagram 19A) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 9083 but not taken up | ||
18/06/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6153 from Tuxford (TUX) | ||
18/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/06/1946. |