|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1909 | 08/02/1909 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
25/07/1910 | 04/11/1910 | 103 days | General | ||||
10/10/1912 | 13/12/1912 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
21/02/1914 | 22/04/1914 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 570 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
23/10/1915 | 19/11/1915 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 501 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
10/04/1918 | 25/06/1918 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
10/11/1919 | 05/02/1920 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 445 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
20/04/1922 | 23/06/1922 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 238 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
1923 | 28/09/1923 | Light Repair | |||||
06/03/1924 | 03/06/1924 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 232 (Diagram 19A) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6146 |
|||
03/02/1926 | 19/03/1926 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 501 (Diagram 19A) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1928 | 31/03/1928 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1930 | 02/08/1930 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8221 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1932 | 29/10/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8222 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1934 | 26/01/1935 | 36 days | General | New cylinders Boiler number 1733 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1938 | 09/04/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1939 | 10/06/1939 | 15 days | Light Repair | Driving wheel spokes broken |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 8 days | Heavy | Special Heavy. Boiler number 8221 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1941 | 16/08/1941 | 27 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1906 | To Service | To service as Lancashire, Derbyshire and East Coast Railway Number A2 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4436 Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) Diagram 19A boiler fitted |
||
01/1908 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1146 | ||
01/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
08/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1928. Dep: 31/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
||
02/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1930. Dep: 02/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8221 (Diagram 19A) |
||
08/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8222 (Diagram 19A) |
||
22/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 26/01/1935. Work undertaken: New cylinders Boiler number 1733 (Diagram 19A) |
||
19/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1729 (Diagram 19A) |
||
27/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 10/06/1939. Work undertaken: Driving wheel spokes broken |
||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. Work undertaken: Special Heavy. Boiler number 8221 (Diagram 19A) |
||
21/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941. | ||
12/07/1943 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6146 from Tuxford (TUX) |