Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 224 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5139 Week
» 16376 Month
» 249296 Year
» 1914672 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1551 m/e 12/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4551 m/e 07/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9431 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69431 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 254
Works Number 1176
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal w/e Mon 07/03/1955
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1907
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37A   Ardsley 4w/e 18/04/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 18/04/1953
WDN   w/e 07/03/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1907 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1551
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1176
   
07/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 4551    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9431    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69431    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
07/03/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69431    

prev prev