Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 276 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5191 Week
» 16428 Month
» 249348 Year
» 1914724 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1554 m/e 12/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4554 m/e 04/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9434 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69434 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 254
Works Number 1179
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal Tue 10/03/1959
Service Life 51 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1907
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HSY   Hornsey w/e 18/12/1948
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 30/06/1951
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 21/07/1951
56C   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 16/02/1957
     Withdrawn on 10/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 18/12/1948
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   on 10/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1907 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1554
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1179
   
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 4554    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9434    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
18/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69434    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
10/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69434    

prev prev