Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 1000 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2074 Week
» 27435 Month
» 260355 Year
» 1925731 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1557 m/e 12/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4557 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9437 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69437 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 254
Works Number 1182
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal Mon 19/07/1954
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1907
BFD   Bradford Hammerton Street on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
ARD   Ardsley w/e 24/04/1948
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 11/12/1948
     Withdrawn on 19/07/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC COP Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 11/12/1948
WDN   on 19/07/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1954 Doncaster Works (scrap roads) On 24/8/54 a visit to the new erecting shop at Doncaster Works revealed the first two (80106-7) of the batch of ten BR standard 2-6-4Ts in early stages of construction and the frames set up for the third (80108). Among engines in the scrap roads, either being cut up or awaiting decision, were 67369 (C12), 67412 (C13), 65002 (J1), 65020 (J2), 65493/95 (J5), 68854/59 (J52), and 69437/82 (N1). A2/1 60507 (64B) was resplendent outside the paint 'shop after general repair. SLS/195410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1907 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1557
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1182
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4557    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9437    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
24/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69437    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
19/07/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69437    

prev prev