Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 293 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5208 Week
» 16445 Month
» 249365 Year
» 1914741 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1559 m/e 12/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4559 m/e 03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9439 on 26/01/1946
British Railways 69439 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 254
Works Number 1184
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal Fri 11/11/1955
Service Life 47 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1907
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 30/06/1951
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 21/07/1951
     Withdrawn on 11/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 30/06/1951
WDN   on 11/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1907 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1559
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1184
   
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4559    
26/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9439    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69439    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
11/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69439    

prev prev