Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 297 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5212 Week
» 16449 Month
» 249369 Year
» 1914745 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1560 m/e 02/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4560 m/e 01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9440 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69440 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 254
Works Number 1185
To Service During 02/1908
Withdrawal Mon 18/03/1957
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1908
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37A   Ardsley 6w/e 25/12/1954
     Withdrawn on 18/03/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 04/12/1954
WDN   on 18/03/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/06/1948 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1908 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1560
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1185
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 4560    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9440    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69440    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
18/03/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69440    

prev prev