Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1561 m/e 03/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4561 m/e 05/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9441 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69441 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 261
Works Number 1256
To Service During 03/1910
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/05/1955
Service Life 45 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1910
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/04/1954
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 5w/e 23/04/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 30/05/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 23/04/1955
WDN   w/e 30/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1910 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1561
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1256
   
05/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 4561    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9441    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69441    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
30/05/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69441    

prev prev