Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 262 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5177 Week
» 16414 Month
» 249334 Year
» 1914710 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1562 m/e 03/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4562 m/e 08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9442 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69442 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 261
Works Number 1257
To Service During 03/1910
Withdrawal Sun 06/09/1953
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1910
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 13/12/1952
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 27/12/1952
     Withdrawn on 06/09/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 27/12/1952
WDN   on 06/09/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1910 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1562
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1257
   
08/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4562    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9442    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69442    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
06/09/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 69442    

prev prev