Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2878 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16284 Week
» 69300 Month
» 188827 Year
» 3215680 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1562 |
m/e |
03/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4562 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9442 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69442 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
261 |
Works Number |
1257 |
To Service |
During 03/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 06/09/1953 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1562 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1257 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4562 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9442 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69442 |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
06/09/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69442 |
|
|