Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 218 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5133 Week
» 16370 Month
» 249290 Year
» 1914666 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1570 m/e 05/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4570 m/e 08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9450 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 69450 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 261
Works Number 1265
To Service During 05/1910
Withdrawal Tue 10/03/1959
Service Life 48 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1910
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 30/06/1951
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/07/1951
     Withdrawn on 10/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 30/06/1951
WDN   on 10/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1910 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1570
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1265
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4570    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9450    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69450    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
10/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69450    

prev prev