Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 255 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5170 Week
» 16407 Month
» 249327 Year
» 1914703 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1573 m/e 12/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4573 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9453 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69453 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 264
Works Number 1288
To Service During 12/1910
Withdrawal Tue 29/04/1958
Service Life 47 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1910
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/04/1954
37A   Ardsley 5w/e 23/04/1955
     Withdrawn on 29/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 26/03/1955
WDN   on 29/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1910 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1573
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1288
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4573    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9453    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69453    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
29/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69453    

prev prev