Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 214 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5129 Week
» 16366 Month
» 249286 Year
» 1914662 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1575 m/e 12/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4575 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9455 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69455 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 264
Works Number 1290
To Service During 12/1910
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/05/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1910
HAT   Hatfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HSY   Hornsey w/e 24/12/1949
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 19/03/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 16/05/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 26/03/1955
WDN   w/e 16/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1910 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1575
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1290
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4575    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9455    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69455    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
16/05/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69455    

prev prev