Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 276 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5191 Week
» 16428 Month
» 249348 Year
» 1914724 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1577 m/e 01/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4577 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9457 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69457 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 264
Works Number 1292
To Service During 01/1911
Withdrawal Tue 23/04/1957
Service Life 46 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1911
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A   Colwick 4w/e 20/02/1954
37A   Ardsley 3w/e 12/11/1955
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 21/04/1956
56C   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 16/03/1957
     Withdrawn on 23/04/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BFD Bradford Hammerton Street m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 28/04/1956
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   on 23/04/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1911 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1577
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1292
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4577    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9457    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69457    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
23/04/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69457    

prev prev