Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 259 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5174 Week
» 16411 Month
» 249331 Year
» 1914707 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1578 m/e 02/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4578 m/e 03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9458 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69458 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 264
Works Number 1293
To Service During 02/1911
Withdrawal Fri 04/11/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1911
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 04/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BFD Bradford Hammerton Street m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 25/10/1947
WDN   on 04/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1911 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1578
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1293
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4578    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9458    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69458    
04/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69458    

prev prev