Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 31 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2106 Week
» 27467 Month
» 260387 Year
» 1925763 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1582 m/e 12/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4582 m/e 05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9462 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69462 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1327
To Service During 12/1911
Withdrawal Fri 03/04/1959
Service Life 47 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1911
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 25/07/1953
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 21/08/1954
34B   Hornsey 5w/e 18/06/1955
56C   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 18/05/1957
     Withdrawn on 03/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HSY Hornsey on 11/03/1948
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 18/05/1957
LOAN 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 15/06/1957
WDN   on 03/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/04/1959 Last N1s The last GN N1s (69462/77) were withdrawn from Copley Hill (56C) on 4th April, atter a long spell of storage at Ardsley. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1911 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1582
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1327
   
05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4582    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9462    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69462    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
03/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69462    

prev prev