Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 262 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5177 Week
» 16414 Month
» 249334 Year
» 1914710 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1583 m/e 12/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4583 m/e 03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9463 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69463 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1328
To Service During 12/1911
Withdrawal Fri 28/10/1955
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1911
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37A   Ardsley w/e 30/06/1951
37A   Ardsley 4w/e 21/07/1951
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley w/e 30/06/1951
WDN   on 28/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1911 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1583
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1328
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4583    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9463    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69463    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
28/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69463    

prev prev