Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 231 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5146 Week
» 16383 Month
» 249303 Year
» 1914679 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1586 m/e 02/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4586 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9466 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69466 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1331
To Service During 02/1912
Withdrawal Mon 04/07/1955
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1912
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HSY   Hornsey w/e 18/12/1948
     Withdrawn on 04/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 18/12/1948
WDN   on 04/07/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1586
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1331
   
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4586    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9466    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
18/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69466    
04/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69466    

prev prev