Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 219 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5134 Week
» 16371 Month
» 249291 Year
» 1914667 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1587 m/e 03/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4587 m/e 10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9467 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69467 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1332
To Service During 03/1912
Withdrawal Mon 02/07/1956
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1912
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/04/1954
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 5w/e 23/04/1955
     Withdrawn on 02/07/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HSY Hornsey on 11/03/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 23/04/1955
WDN   on 02/07/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1587
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1332
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4587    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9467    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69467    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
02/07/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 69467    

prev prev