Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 269 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5184 Week
» 16421 Month
» 249341 Year
» 1914717 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1588 m/e 03/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4588 m/e 03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9468 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69468 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1333
To Service During 03/1912
Withdrawal Mon 08/03/1954
Service Life 42 yrs , 7 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1912
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HSY   Hornsey w/e 24/12/1949
34A   Kings Cross 4w/e 20/06/1953
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 25/07/1953
     Withdrawn on 08/03/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HAT Hatfield on 11/03/1948
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   on 08/03/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1588
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1333
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4588    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9468    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69468    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
08/03/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69468    

prev prev