Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 970 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2044 Week
» 27405 Month
» 260325 Year
» 1925701 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1590 m/e 04/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4590 m/e 11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9470 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69470 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1335
To Service During 04/1912
Withdrawal Mon 06/08/1956
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1912
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34A   Kings Cross 4w/e 20/06/1953
34B   Hornsey 4w/e 25/07/1953
     Withdrawn on 06/08/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   on 06/08/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1590
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1335
   
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4590    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9470    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69470    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
06/08/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 69470    

prev prev