Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 275 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5190 Week
» 16427 Month
» 249347 Year
» 1914723 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1591 m/e 04/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4591 m/e 12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9471 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69471 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1336
To Service During 04/1912
Withdrawal Mon 16/01/1956
Service Life 43 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1912
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 21/08/1954
     Withdrawn on 16/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 11/09/1954
WDN   on 16/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1591
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1336
   
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4591    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9471    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69471    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
16/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 69471    

prev prev