Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 213 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5128 Week
» 16365 Month
» 249285 Year
» 1914661 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1593 m/e 04/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4592 m/e 02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9472 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69472 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1338
To Service During 04/1912
Withdrawal Thu 21/08/1958
Service Life 46 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1912
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37A   Ardsley 5w/e 24/03/1951
37A   Ardsley m/e 31/03/1951
     Withdrawn on 21/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   on 21/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1593
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1338
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4592    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9472    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69472    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
21/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69472    

prev prev