|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1596 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1341 |
||
03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4596 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9476 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69476 | ||
21/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY) | ||
24/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
14/03/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69476 |