Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 246 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5161 Week
» 16398 Month
» 249318 Year
» 1914694 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1596 m/e 05/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4596 m/e 03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9476 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69476 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 268
Works Number 1341
To Service During 05/1912
Withdrawal w/e Mon 14/03/1955
Service Life 42 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1912
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HSY   Hornsey w/e 21/01/1950
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/04/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 14/03/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 24/04/1954
WDN   w/e 14/03/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1596
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1341
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4596    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9476    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69476    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
14/03/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69476    

prev prev