Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 257 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5172 Week
» 16409 Month
» 249329 Year
» 1914705 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1597 m/e 06/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4597 m/e 11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9477 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69477 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 268
Works Number 1342
To Service During 06/1912
Withdrawal Thu 02/04/1959
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1912
HSY   Hornsey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 20/09/1952
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 04/10/1952
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 21/08/1954
34B   Hornsey 4w/e 19/02/1955
56C   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 15/06/1957
     Withdrawn on 02/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 26/02/1955
LOAN 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 15/06/1957
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 02/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. SLS/195004
04/04/1959 Last N1s The last GN N1s (69462/77) were withdrawn from Copley Hill (56C) on 4th April, atter a long spell of storage at Ardsley. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1597
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1342
   
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4597    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9477    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69477    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
19/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
15/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
02/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69477    

prev prev