Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 298 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5213 Week
» 16450 Month
» 249370 Year
» 1914746 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1601 m/e 06/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4601 m/e 08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9481 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 69481 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 268
Works Number 1346
To Service During 06/1912
Withdrawal Mon 28/05/1956
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1912
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HSY   Hornsey w/e 21/01/1950
38A   Colwick 4w/e 23/01/1954
37A   Ardsley 3w/e 12/11/1955
     Withdrawn on 28/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 05/11/1955
WDN   on 28/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1601
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1346
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4601    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9481    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69481    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
28/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 69481    

prev prev