Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2609 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16015 Week
» 69031 Month
» 188558 Year
» 3215411 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1602 |
m/e |
06/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4602 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9482 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69482 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
268 |
Works Number |
1347 |
To Service |
During 06/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 30/08/1954 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1912 |
BFD |
|
Bradford Hammerton Street |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/08/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/08/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1954 |
Doncaster Works (scrap roads) |
On 24/8/54 a visit to the new erecting shop at Doncaster Works revealed the first two (80106-7) of the batch of ten BR standard 2-6-4Ts in early stages of construction and the frames set up for the third (80108). Among engines in the scrap roads, either being cut up or awaiting decision, were 67369 (C12), 67412 (C13), 65002 (J1), 65020 (J2), 65493/95 (J5), 68854/59 (J52), and 69437/82 (N1). A2/1 60507 (64B) was resplendent outside the paint 'shop after general repair. |
SLS/195410 |
28/09/1954 |
Doncaster Works (scrap roads) |
Under construction in the new erecting shop on 28/9/54 were 80106 (almost complete) and 80107-110. Engines in the scrap roads included 65002, 65493/95, 68799 an 69482. Ivatt Class 4 2-6-0s under repair were 43016 an 43126. |
SLS/195411 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1602 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1347 |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4602 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9482 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69482 |
|
|
30/08/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69482 |
|
|