Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3053 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16459 Week
» 69475 Month
» 189002 Year
» 3215855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1603 |
m/e |
06/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4603 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9483 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69483 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
268 |
Works Number |
1348 |
To Service |
During 06/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/03/1955 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
w/e |
18/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1603 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1348 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4603 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9483 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69483 |
|
|
18/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) |
|
|
07/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69483 |
|
|