Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 259 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5174 Week
» 16411 Month
» 249331 Year
» 1914707 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1603 m/e 06/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4603 m/e 02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9483 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 69483 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 268
Works Number 1348
To Service During 06/1912
Withdrawal w/e Mon 07/03/1955
Service Life 42 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1912
BFD   Bradford Hammerton Street on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 18/02/1951
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 24/03/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 18/02/1951
WDN   w/e 07/03/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1603
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1348
   
02/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4603    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9483    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69483    
18/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
07/03/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69483    

prev prev