Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 287 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5202 Week
» 16439 Month
» 249359 Year
» 1914735 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 1604 m/e 06/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4604 m/e 09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9484 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 69484 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 268
Works Number 1349
To Service During 06/1912
Withdrawal Mon 30/09/1957
Service Life 45 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1912
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HAT   Hatfield w/e 12/06/1948
37A   Ardsley w/e 29/09/1951
37A   Ardsley 4w/e 20/10/1951
     Withdrawn on 30/09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HAT Hatfield w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 37A Ardsley w/e 29/09/1951
WDN   on 30/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1604
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1349
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4604    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9484    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
12/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69484    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
30/09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69484    

prev prev