Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1722 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4722 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9501 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69501 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22578 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 20/11/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HAT |
Hatfield |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
15/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
35B |
Grantham |
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
20/02/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/11/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1927 |
Condensers removed |
02/1928 |
Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
02/1940 |
Vacuum |
12/1950 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1722 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22578 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4722 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
02/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
|
|
02/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9501 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
12/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69501 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
20/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69501 |
|
|