|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1920 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1728 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22584 |
||
02/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4728 | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake | ||
11/1945 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum | ||
03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9507 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69507 | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kipps (65E) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
22/04/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69507 |