Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1730 |
m/e |
01/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4730 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9509 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69509 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22586 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 01/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/10/1960 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1921 |
KPS |
|
Kipps |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65C |
|
Parkhead |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
65D |
|
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
65C |
|
Parkhead |
8w/e |
31/08/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/10/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/10/1960 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1928 |
Condensers removed |
10/1932 |
Condenser fitted |
11/1932 |
Condensers removed |
02/1948 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1954 |
Robinson pattern superheater removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1730 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22586 |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4730 |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Condenser fitted |
|
|
11/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9509 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
02/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69509 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
11/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater removed |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69509 |
|
|