Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4245 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17651 Week
» 70667 Month
» 190194 Year
» 3217047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1737 |
m/e |
02/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4737 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9516 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69516 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22593 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 02/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 26/01/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1927 |
Condensers removed |
10/1928 |
Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
03/1940 |
Vacuum |
09/1944 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1737 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22593 |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4737 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
|
|
03/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum |
|
|
09/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9516 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69516 |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (34F) |
|
|
26/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69516 |
|
|