|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1752 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22608 |
||
03/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4752 | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9531 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) | ||
11/1949 | Modification | Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69531 | ||
07/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) | ||
11/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
27/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
07/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69531 |